EP0292936 - Device for administering solid preparations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 554 / JP | For all designated states Nissho Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu, 531-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states NISSHO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | |||
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states NISSHO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi, 3-chome Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | |||
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 40, Dosho-machi 2-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states NISSHO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi, 3-chome Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujioka, Keiji 27-5, Tsukaguchi-cho 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Tamura, Nobuhiko 10-4-423, Sonehigashi-cho 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Takada, Yoshihiro 9-1-404, Tamagawa 1-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Himeshima, Kenji 3-7-15-305, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108328.1 | 25.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | JP19870129439 | 26.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12943987 | JP19870079259U | 26.05.1987 Original published format: JP 7925987 U | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292936 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292936 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292936 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M36/00 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
A61M37/0069 (EP,US);
A61M5/178 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1988/48] | A61M37/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verabreichung von festen Präparaten | [1988/48] | English: | Device for administering solid preparations | [1988/48] | French: | Dispositif pour l'administration de préparations solides | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 30.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1996 | [2000/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1881854 (JOSEPH MUIR); | [A]US2009393 (GIOACCHINO FAILLA); | [A]US3153496 (JOHNSON ROYCE E); | [A]US3921632 (BARDANI FRANK M); | [A]US4451253 (HARMAN SHERMAN M [US]) |