EP0305651 - Euro-AV television receiver socket connection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Hermann GRUNDIG E.M.V. Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-8510 Fürth/Bay. / DE | [1989/10] | Application number, filing date | 88108393.5 | 26.05.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | DE19873729146 | 01.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3729146 | [1989/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305651 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/45, H04N5/262 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
H04N5/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/10] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Anschluss an die Euro-AV-Buchse eines Fernsehempfängers | [1989/10] | English: | Euro-AV television receiver socket connection device | [1989/10] | French: | Dispositif pour le couplage à la douille Euro-AV d'un récepteur de télévision | [1989/10] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 25.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3104843 [ ] | [ ] - Funkschau 26/1986, Munchen Helmut Mitschke "Bild im Bild" seiten 26-31 *seite 26, Bild 1* |