EP0309650 - Driving device for extending and withdrawing operative members of a space vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONTRAVES ITALIANA S.p.A. Via Affile 102 I-00131 Roma / IT | [1989/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grattarola, Maurizio, Dr.-Ing. Piazza M.B. Bulgarelli, 55 I-00139 Roma / IT | 02 /
Stella, Domenico, Dr.-Ing. Via Sorelle Tetrazzini, 47 c I-00139 Roma / IT | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia, et al Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Forattini, Amelia, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88108607.8 | 30.05.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | IT19870022056 | 29.09.1987 Original published format: IT 2205687 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0309650 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0309650 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309650 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/44 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
H01Q1/08 (EP,US);
B64G1/222 (US);
B64G1/2229 (EP);
B64G1/44 (EP,US);
Y10T74/11 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18224 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Betätigungsvorrichtung zum Entfalten und Zusammenfalten von Betriebsvorrichtungen eines Raumfahrzeugs | [1989/14] | English: | Driving device for extending and withdrawing operative members of a space vehicle | [1989/14] | French: | Dispositif d'actionnement pour l'extension et la rétraction de dispositifs actifs d'un véhicule spatial | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3587999 (MINIOVITCH WLADIMIR, et al); | [A]FR2288881 (DARCOURT JEAN [FR]); | [A]DE2717426 (FOKKER VFW); | [A]FR2562724 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |