EP0344338 - Method for manufacturing partially dyed synthetic resin frames of eyeglasses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA MINOWA GANKYO 2-7-35, Sakura-cho Sabae-shi Fukui-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA MINOWA GANKYO 2-7-35, Sakura-cho Sabae-shi Fukui-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minowa, Toshiaki Kabushiki Kaisha Minowa Gankyo 2-7-35, Sakura-cho Sabae-shi Fukui-ken / JP | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108628.4 | 30.05.1988 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344338 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29D12/02, G02C5/00, B05D1/32 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
B29D12/02 (EP);
B05D1/322 (EP);
B05D5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von zum Teil gefärbten Brillenfassungen | [1989/49] | English: | Method for manufacturing partially dyed synthetic resin frames of eyeglasses | [1989/49] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de montures de lunettes partiellement teintes | [1989/49] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/03] | 27.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.06.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2158368 ; | [Y]US4531947 ; | [A]US4358482 |