EP0293835 - Apparatus for enabling transit of articles between adjacent surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOLDCO INDUSTRIES, INC. 15097 West 44th Golden Colorado 80401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states GOLDCO INDUSTRIES, INC. 15097 West 44th Golden Colorado 80401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pearce, Ronald A. 2997 Pierson Way Lakewood Colorado 80215 / US | 02 /
Kapke, Milton W. 406 North Ford Golden Colorado 80403 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108697.9 | 31.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | US19870057036 | 01.06.1987 Original published format: US 57036 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293835 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293835 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/24, B65G47/66 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
B65G47/66 (EP,US);
B65G57/005 (EP,US);
B65G57/04 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Überleiten von Gegenständen zwischen benachbarten Flächen | [1988/49] | English: | Apparatus for enabling transit of articles between adjacent surfaces | [1988/49] | French: | Appareil de transfert d'articles entre des surfaces adjacentes | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 18.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3897877 [ ] (VANDERMEER RICHARD H, et al); | DE1931274 [ ] |