EP0344346 - Optical switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Yoshimasa 2-18-16, Ohto Yono-shi Saitama-prefecture / JP | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108781.1 | 01.06.1988 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344346 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344346 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/17 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
G02F1/174 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/49] | Title | German: | Optische Schaltvorrichtung | [1989/49] | English: | Optical switching device | [1989/49] | French: | Dispositif de commutation optique | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Request for further processing for: | 08.01.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3854795 | [X] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, Supplements, vol. 24, suppl. 24-3, 1985, pages 45-48, Tokyo, JP; K. YOSHINO et al.: "Characteristics of electro-optic effect of ferroelectric liquid crystals in infrared range" | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 22, no. 3, part 2, March 1983, pages L157-L158, Tokyo, JP; K. YOSHINO et al.: "Proposal of electro-optical switching and memory devices utilizing doping and undoping processes of conducting polymers" | [A] - POLYMER JOURNAL, vol. 19, no. 1, 1987, pages 147-156; R.S. POTEMBER et al.: "Electronic devices from conducting organics and polymers" |