EP0294797 - Automatic gear change device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIESEL KIKI CO., LTD. No. 6-7, Shibuya 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states DIESEL KIKI CO., LTD. No. 6-7, Shibuya 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Yuji c/o Diesel Kiki Co., Ltd. Higashi-matsuyama Factory 13-26, Yakyucho 3-chome Higashi-matsuyama Saitama / JP | 02 /
Kono, Hiromi c/o Diesel Kiki Co., Ltd. Higashi-matsuyama Factory 13-26, Yakyucho 3-chome Higashi-matsuyama Saitama / JP | 03 /
Tanoue, Akifumi c/o Diesel Kiki Co., Ltd. Higashi-matsuyama Factory 13-26, Yakyucho 3-chome Higashi-matsuyama Saitama / JP | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm, et al Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Weidener, Postfach 10 13 54 D-45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109172.2 | 09.06.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | JP19870146725 | 12.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14672587 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0294797 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0294797 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294797 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/22 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W2710/021 (EP,US);
B60W2710/1005 (EP,US);
F16H61/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/50] | Title | German: | Automatische Gangwechselvorrichtung | [1988/50] | English: | Automatic gear change device | [1988/50] | French: | Changement de vitesse automatique | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0114513 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]); | [Y]DE3334710 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]); | [A]DE3605706 (DIESEL KIKI CO [JP]); | [XP]DE3730715 (DIESEL KIKI CO [JP]); | [A]GB2072883 (NISSAN MOTOR) | [A] - INGENIEURS DE L'AUTOMAOBILE. no. 8, November 1984, pages 71-78; MM.P.-J. SALVAY et al.: "Le multiplexage Lucas". |