EP0296457 - A high performance parallel binary byte adder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Putrino, Michael 425 Church Street Endicott, N.Y. 13760 / US | 02 /
Schwarz, Eric M. 5A Jane Lacey Drive Endicott, N.Y. 13760 / US | 03 /
Vassiliadis, Stamatis 717 Vestal Road Vestal, N.Y. 13850 / US | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Bonneau, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Bonneau, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1988/52] | Combeau, Jacques Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 88109439.5 | 14.06.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | US19870066580 | 26.06.1987 Original published format: US 66580 | [1988/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0296457 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0296457 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/50 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
G06F7/505 (EP,US);
G06F2207/382 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/52] | Title | German: | Hochleistungsparalleladdierer für Binärbytes | [1988/52] | English: | A high performance parallel binary byte adder | [1988/52] | French: | Additionneur parallèle de bytes binaires à haute performance | [1988/52] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/49] | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/49] | Appeal following examination | 28.07.1994 | Appeal received No. T0896/94 | 24.10.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.02.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1995/06] | 20.07.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/29] | 19.10.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1996 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3987291 (GOODING DAVID N, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 7, no. 6, November 1964, pages 451-452, New York, US; M. SCHMOOKLER: "Threshold carry look-ahead for parallel binary adder" |