EP0297358 - Show case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Oepen, Erhard, Dipl.-Ing. Steinhauserbergstrasse 51 D-5830 Schwelm / DE | 02 /
Kuckart, Leonhard Hattingerstrasse 37 D-5830 Schwelm / DE | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109603.6 | 16.06.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | DE19873721420 | 29.06.1987 Original published format: DE 3721420 | [1989/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0297358 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297358 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/00, A47B95/04 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
A47F3/007 (EP);
A47B95/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/01] | Title | German: | Verkaufsmöbel | [1989/01] | English: | Show case | [1989/01] | French: | Vitrine | [1989/01] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2769275 (LINDGREN ROBERT D); | [A]FR2101545 (LINDE AG); | [Y]EP0147739 (LINDE AG [DE]) |