EP0297414 - Bow-tie tree resistant electrical insulating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Cable, Ltd. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states HITACHI CABLE, LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Kiyoshi Hitachi Cable Ltd. 1-1, Hidaka-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Yamazaki, Takanori Hitachi Cable Ltd. 1-1, Hidaka-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Yagyu, Hideki Hitachi Cable Ltd. 1-1, Hidaka-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Kanaoka, Mamoru Hitachi Cable Ltd. 1-1, Hidaka-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki / JP | 05 /
Hanawa, Katsutoshi Hitachi Cable Ltd. 1-1, Hidaka-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki / JP | 06 /
Ikeda, Chuki Hitachi Cable Ltd. 1-1, Hidaka-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki / JP | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/01] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109939.4 | 22.06.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | JP19870157037 | 24.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15703787 | JP19880075741 | 29.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7574188 | [1989/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0297414 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0297414 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297414 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/30, C08L23/02, C08K5/09, H01B7/28 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
H01B7/2813 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/101 (EP,US);
H01B3/441 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L23/02 (US,EP);
C08K5/09, C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/101, C08L23/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1989/01] | Title | German: | Wasserbäumchenresistente elektrische Isolationszusammensetzung | [1989/01] | English: | Bow-tie tree resistant electrical insulating composition | [1989/01] | French: | Composition d'isolation électrique résistant à l'arborescence | [1989/01] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP58220304 ; | [Y]US3474058 (RIDGEWAY LEE R, et al); | [A]DE3242434 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2330564 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [A]US4345046 (EJK ADAM J, et al) | [YD] - DATABASE WPIL,AN=84-032495 Derwent Publications Ltd,London,GB; & JP-A-58 220 304 (Hitachi Cable KK) 21-12-1983, & JP58220304 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER DELIVERY vol. PWRD-, no. 1, 1986, NEW YORK US pages 27 - 33; K.WATANABE ET AL.: "Development of New Water Tree Suppressive XLPE Cable" |