EP0299244 - Processing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Cecil J Route 4, Box 113 C Greenville Texas 75401 / US | 02 /
Loewenstein, Lee M. 1809 Cortez Drive Plano Texas 75074 / US | 03 /
Jucha, Rhett B. Route 2, Box 149 Celeste Texas 75423 / US | 04 /
Matthews, Robert T. 2417 Parkhaven Drive Plano Texas 75075 / US | 05 /
Hildenbrand, Randall C. 634 Westover Richardson Texas 75080 / US | 06 /
Freeman, Dean W. 2513 Richland Drive Garland Texas 75042 / US | 07 /
Jones, John I. 7700 Jerome Drive Plano Texas 75023 / US | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/03] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109990.7 | 23.06.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | US19870074398 | 16.07.1987 Original published format: US 74398 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299244 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299244 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/48, C23C16/50, C23C16/54 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
C23C16/482 (EP);
C23C16/48 (KR);
C23C16/517 (EP);
C23C16/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/03] | Title | German: | Behandlungsapparat und Verfahren | [1989/03] | English: | Processing apparatus and method | [1989/03] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de traitement | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Request for further processing for: | 23.07.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.09.1993 | NL | 08.09.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1994/45] | NL | 08.09.1993 | |
FR | 28.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 08.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60197233 ; | [A]JP6156280 ; | [A]JP6227573 ; | [A]JP59148326 ; | [A]JP57167631 ; | [X]EP0198361 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0243074 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]DE3331261 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US3916822 (ROBINSON MCDONALD); | [A]US4588610 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 49 (C-330)[2106], 26th February 1986; & JP-A-60 197 233 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 05-10-1985, & JP60197233 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 219 (C-363)[2275], 31st July 1986; & JP-A-61 56 280 (YASUO TARUI) 20-03-1986, & JP6156280 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 206 (C-433)[2653], 3rd July 1987; & JP-A-62 27 573 (YASUO TARUI) 05-02-1987, & JP6227573 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 281 (E-286)[1718], 21st December 1984; & JP-A-59 148 326 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 25-08-1984, & JP59148326 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 8 (E-152)[1153], 13th January 1983; & JP-A-57 167 631 (FUJITSU K.K.) 15-10-1982, & JP57167631 A 00000000 |