EP0297433 - Electronically-controlled fuel injection system for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.09.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamifuji, Hiroshi 2785-28, Tsuda Katsuta-shi / JP | 02 /
Tanabe, Yoshiyuki 3271-143, Mutsuno Nakane Katsuta-shi / JP | 03 /
Morita, Kiyomi 1181-100, Higashiishikawa Katsuta-shi / JP | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110025.9 | 23.06.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | JP19870165197 | 03.07.1987 Original published format: JP 16519787 | [1989/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0297433 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0297433 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297433 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/34, F02D41/26, F02D41/24 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
F02D41/2474 (EP,US);
F02D41/04 (KR);
F02D41/2409 (EP,US);
F02D41/2441 (EP,US);
F02D41/34 (KR);
F02D41/2445 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/01] | F02D41/34, F02D41/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/01] | Title | German: | Elektronisch gesteuertes Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1989/01] | English: | Electronically-controlled fuel injection system for internal combustion engines | [1989/01] | French: | Système d'injection de carburant commandé électroniquement pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1989/01] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.1992
31.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1992/38] | 27.08.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.03.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.06.1993 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 14.06.1993 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.02.1993 | [1993/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8603258 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0170834 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4359894 (IKEURA KENJI, et al); | [AP]WO8706336 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [AP]WO8706689 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [AP]US4714067 (STAERZL RICHARD E [US]); | [A]EP0185945 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | Examination | - Halliday;Resnick, Physics, p. 542, John Wiley (US), 1967 |