EP0299257 - Recording apparatus and recording method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooba, Yuji 4-19-11-102 Sekimachi Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sugihara, Shigeo 2-1-30 Fujimidai Kunitachi-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Masumori, Tadaaki 3-22-18, Gakuennishicho Kodaira-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shiwa, Shinichi 7-6-105, Tsukui Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110131.5 | 24.06.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | JP19870165186 | 03.07.1987 Original published format: JP 16518687 | JP19870301411 | 01.12.1987 Original published format: JP 30141187 | JP19870301412 | 01.12.1987 Original published format: JP 30141287 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299257 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299257 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46, H04N1/04 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
G03B33/08 (EP,US);
H04N1/195 (EP,US);
H04N1/40031 (EP,US);
H04N1/508 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1989/03] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsgerät und -verfahren | [1989/03] | English: | Recording apparatus and recording method using the same | [1989/03] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'enregistrement | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 28.06.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4366499 [ ] (MIR JOSE M); | US4374397 [ ] (MIR JOSE M); | EP0165550 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, Section P, Vol. 10, No. 282, September 25, 1986 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 152 P 500 * KokaiNo. 61-103 122 (Konishiroku) * |