EP0298334 - Shock wave generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rattner, Manfred Am Eichengarten 8 D-8521 Buckenhof / DE | [1989/02] | Application number, filing date | 88110225.5 | 27.06.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | DE19870009363U | 07.07.1987 Original published format: DE 8709363 U | [1989/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298334 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298334 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G10K9/12, G10K11/32 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
G10K9/12 (EP,US);
G10K11/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/02] | Title | German: | Stosswellenquelle | [1989/02] | English: | Shock wave generator | [1989/02] | French: | Dispositif générateur d'ondes de choc | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 02.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0209053 (EISENMENGER WOLFGANG); | [A]EP0095383 (ONTARIO CANCER INST [CA]); | [A]EP0133946 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]GB704633 (BRUSH DEV CO) |