EP0298369 - Heat-exchange element in the form of a corrugated hose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Witzenmann GmbH Metallschlauch-Fabrik Pforzheim Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 134 75175 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states Witzenmann GmbH Metallschlauch-Fabrik Pforzheim Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 134 D-75175 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schüttler, Peter Forststrasse 18 D-7532 Niefern-Öschelbronn / DE | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Lemcke, Rupert, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Lemcke, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1989/02] | Lemcke, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer Bismarckstrasse 16 Postfach 4026 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110461.6 | 30.06.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | DE19873722520 | 08.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3722520 | [1989/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298369 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/08 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
F16L11/15 (EP);
F28F1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/02] | Title | German: | Wärmeaustauschelement in Form eines Wellschlauches | [1989/02] | English: | Heat-exchange element in the form of a corrugated hose | [1989/02] | French: | Elément d'échange de chaleur en forme d'un tube ondulé | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.01.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 20.08.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/45] | Appeal following examination | 30.03.1991 | Appeal received No. T0464/91 | 27.05.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.08.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3025623 ; | [A]US2152280 ; | [A]US3794080 ; | [A]US3313319 ; | [A]DE1551488 ; | [A]US2582249 |