EP0302232 - Flat tube for a heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states Süddeutsche Kühlerfabrik Julius Fr. Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 D-7000 Stuttgart 30 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Dieter Kapfenburgstrasse 43 D-7000 Stuttgart 30 / DE | 02 /
Helms, Werner Rotenstrasse 22 D-7300 Esslingen-Zell / DE | 03 /
Kern, Josef Im Bühl 5 D-7077 Alfdorf / DE | 04 /
Schwarz, Gebhard Jörgstrasse 16 D-7000 Stuttgart 31 / DE | 05 /
Zdora, Dietmar Wilhelm-Raabe-Strasse 11 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Riedel, Peter, et al Behr GmbH & Co. Patentabteilung Postfach 30 09 20 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Riedel, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Behr GmbH & Co., Patentabteilung, Postfach 30 09 20 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110537.3 | 01.07.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | DE19873725602 | 01.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3725602 | [1989/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302232 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302232 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/02, F28F1/40, // F28F13/12 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
F28F3/046 (EP);
F28D1/0391 (EP);
F28F1/022 (EP);
F28F1/40 (EP);
F28F13/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Flachrohr für einen Wärmetauscher | [1989/06] | English: | Flat tube for a heat exchanger | [1989/06] | French: | Tube plat pour un échangeur de chaleur | [1989/06] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2373218 (ARNOLD ARTHUR B); | [Y]CH341520 (MORRIS MOTORS LTD [GB]); | [AD]DE2506434 (GRAENGES ESSEM AB); | [A]GB1599395 (IMI MARSTON RADIATORS LTD); | [A]DE3216140 (LAENGERER & REICH KUEHLER); | [AD]US2488615 (ARNOLD ARTHUR B); | [A]FR1554962 ; | [A]FR470926 (AUTO RADIATEUR ANCIENS ETABLIS [BE]); | [A]GB2166862 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR) |