EP0291102 - Aqueous metal-working fluids for metal cutting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.1990 [1990/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states del Ross, Sergio, Dr. Via Felice Venosta 33 I-20143 Milano / IT | For all designated states del Ross, Renate, Dr. Via Felice Venosta 33 I-20143 Milano / IT | [1988/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68 85201 Dachau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Beszédes, Stephan G., Dr. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68 D-85201 Dachau / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110542.3 | 01.07.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | IT19870022620 | 13.11.1987 Original published format: IT 2262087 | [1988/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0291102 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0291102 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C10M173/02, // (C10M173/02, 125:24, 125:26), C10N40:20, C10N40:22 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
C10M173/02 (EP);
C10M125/24 (EP);
C10M125/26 (EP);
C10M129/06 (EP);
C10M129/10 (EP);
C10M129/70 (EP);
C10M145/28 (EP);
C10M145/36 (EP);
C10M2201/02 (EP);
C10M2201/085 (EP);
C10M2201/087 (EP);
C10M2201/10 (EP);
C10M2201/102 (EP);
C10M2201/105 (EP);
C10M2207/021 (EP);
C10M2207/023 (EP);
C10M2207/026 (EP);
C10M2207/027 (EP);
C10M2207/04 (EP);
C10M2207/281 (EP);
C10M2207/282 (EP);
C10M2207/283 (EP);
C10M2207/284 (EP);
C10M2207/286 (EP);
C10M2209/104 (EP);
C10M2209/108 (EP);
C10M2229/02 (EP);
C10M2229/041 (EP);
C10M2229/05 (EP);
C10N2040/20 (EP);
C10N2040/22 (EP);
C10N2040/24 (EP);
C10N2040/241 (EP);
C10N2040/242 (EP);
C10N2040/243 (EP);
C10N2040/244 (EP);
C10N2040/245 (EP);
C10N2040/246 (EP);
C10N2040/247 (EP);
C10N2050/01 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Wässrige Metallbearbeitungsflüssigkeiten für spanabhebende Schneidearbeiten | [1988/46] | English: | Aqueous metal-working fluids for metal cutting | [1988/46] | French: | Fluides aqueux pour couper du métal en enlevant des copeaux | [1988/46] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/19] | 12.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE749578 ; | [X]DE749500 ; | [X]GB716354 (BATAAFSCHE PETROLEUM); | [X]US3007871 (PARDEE ROBERT P, et al); | [X]DE1594377 (COLLARDIN GMBH GERHARD); | [X]FR2217411 (PETROLCHEMISCHES KOMBINAT [DD]); | [X]FR2363623 (KOSAKEWITCH MICHEL [FR]); | [X]US4639323 (LIAO TSONG K [US]) |