EP0309660 - Frame saw blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ernst Winter & Sohn (GmbH & Co.) Osterstrasse 58 D-20259 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states ERNST WINTER & SOHN (GMBH & CO.) Osterstrasse 58 D-20259 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Willi Waldschneise 53 D-2000 Norderstedt / DE | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Minetti, Ralf Bismarck Allee 2 24105 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Minetti, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Ballindamm 15 D-20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110633.0 | 04.07.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | DE19873733299 | 02.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3733299 | [1989/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309660 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309660 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/12 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
B28D1/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Gattersägeblatt | [1989/14] | English: | Frame saw blade | [1989/14] | French: | Lame de scie alternative à cadre | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1093114 ; | [X]US2969053 (WENTZEL RICHARD R); | [X]GB191300106 (GEORGE ANDERSON AND COMPANY 19, et al); | [A]US1866356 (JONES HOMER V) | Examination | GB106 | - GB-A- 106 / A.D. 1913, & GB106 A 00000000 |