EP0350521 - Process for the production of 2,3,5,6-tetrachloropyridine and 2,3,6-trichloropyridine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOWELANCO 9002 Purdue Road Indianapolis Indiana 46268-3030 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states DOWELANCO 9002 Purdue Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46268-3030 / US | ||
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DesJardin, Michael A. 100 Cobblestone Lane San Ramon, Ca. 94 583 / US | 02 /
Kindorf, Todd E. 472B 41st Street Oakland, Ca. 94 611 / US | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111233.8 | 13.07.1988 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0350521 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/61 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
C07D213/61 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, ES [1990/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2,3,5,6-Tetrachlorpyridin und 2,3,6-Trichlorpyridin | [1990/03] | English: | Process for the production of 2,3,5,6-tetrachloropyridine and 2,3,6-trichloropyridine | [1990/03] | French: | Procédé de production de la 2,3,5,6-tétrachloropyridine et de la 2,3,6-trichloropyridine | [1990/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/31] | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3420833 (TAPLIN WILLIAM H); | [A]US3538100 (SMITH ERIC); | [A]EP0239904 (MAKHTESHIM CHEM WORKS LTD [IL]) |