EP0300387 - Phenyl alkenylcarboxylic acids and their esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plath, Peter Hans-Balcke-Strasse 13 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Eicken, Karl Am Huettenwingert 12 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
Goetz, Norbert, Dr. Schoefferstrasse 25 D-6520 Worms 1 / DE | 04 /
Wild, Jochen, Dr. An der Marlach 7 D-6705 Deidesheim / DE | 05 /
Meyer, Norbert, Dr. Dossenheimer Weg 22 D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | 06 /
Wuerzer, Bruno, Dr. Ruedigerstrasse 13 D-6701 Otterstadt / DE | [1989/04] | Application number, filing date | 88111455.7 | 16.07.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | DE19873724399 | 23.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3724399 | [1989/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300387 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300387 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300387 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/48, A01N37/32, C07C205/56, C07C229/44 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
A01N37/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/04] | C07D209/48, A01N37/32, C07C79/46, C07C101/453 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/04] | Title | German: | Phenylalkenylcarbonsäuren und deren Ester | [1989/04] | English: | Phenyl alkenylcarboxylic acids and their esters | [1989/04] | French: | Acides phénylalkénylcarboxylique et leurs esters | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61027962 ; | [YD]JP59155358 ; | [X]DE2210672 (BAYER AG); | [E]EP0240659 (BASF AG [DE]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 105, 1986, Seite 606, Zusammenfassung Nr. 60524v, Columbus, Ohio, US; S. MATSUMOTO et al.: "Herbicidal N-substituted dicarboxyimides", & JP-A-61 027 962, & JP61027962 A 00000000 | [YD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 102, 1985, Zusammenfassung Nr. 24478n, Columbus, Ohio, US; "4,5,6,7-Tetrahydro-2H-isoindole-1,3-diones"; & JP-A-59 155 358, & JP59155358 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 79, 1973, Seiten 288,289, Zusammenfassung Nr. 41607c, Columbus, Ohio, US; E.R. KRAJNIAK et al.: "Tropolones and other products from a Reimer-Tiemann reaction", & AUST. J. CHEM. 1973, 26(6), 1337-51 |