EP0303069 - Process for the preparation of oligomeric or polymeric radiation-reactive preadducts for solvent-structured coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blum, Rainer Bannwasserstrasse 58 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1989/07] | Application number, filing date | 88111457.3 | 16.07.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | DE19873724368 | 23.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3724368 | [1989/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303069 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303069 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303069 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0303069 | Date: | 22.10.1992 | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/64, C08G18/38, C08G18/34, C08G18/81, C08G18/67, C08G73/10, G03F7/00, H05K3/00 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
G03F7/0388 (EP);
C08G18/348 (EP);
C08G18/3821 (EP);
C08G18/6415 (EP);
C08G18/643 (EP);
C08G18/671 (EP);
C08G18/711 (EP);
C08G18/8108 (EP);
C08G18/8158 (EP);
C08G73/1035 (EP);
G03F7/027 (EP);
G03F7/038 (EP);
G03F7/0387 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/8158, C08G18/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung oligomerer oder polymerer strahlungsreaktiver Vorstufen für lösungsmittel-strukturierte Schichten | [1989/07] | English: | Process for the preparation of oligomeric or polymeric radiation-reactive preadducts for solvent-structured coatings | [1989/07] | French: | Procédé de préparation de préadducts oligomères ou polymères réactifs sous l'influence de l'irradiation pour des revêtements structurés par du solvant | [1989/07] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0027506 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4338427 (MAEKAWA IWAO, et al); | [A]GB1173608 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]GB1060576 (TOYO RAYON CO LTD); | [A]US3814776 (FISCHER R, et al) |