EP0301370 - Hydroxyalkyl-azol derivatives and their use as fungicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1989 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.11.1989 [1989/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulz, Guenter, Dr. Carl-Bosch-Strasse 96 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Sauter, Hubert, Dr. Neckarpromenade 20 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 03 /
Ammermann, Eberhard, Dr. Sachsenstrasse 3 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Pommer, Ernst-Heinrich, Dr. Berliner Platz 7 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [1989/05] | Application number, filing date | 88111570.3 | 19.07.1988 | [1989/05] | Priority number, date | DE19873724645 | 25.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3724645 | [1989/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0301370 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, C07D233/60, A01N43/653, A01N43/50 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
C07D233/58 (KR);
A01N43/50 (EP);
A01N43/653 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/05] | Title | German: | Hydroxyethyl-azol-Derivate und ihre Verwendung als Fungizide | [1989/05] | English: | Hydroxyalkyl-azol derivatives and their use as fungicides | [1989/05] | French: | Dérivés d'hydroxyéthylazoles et leur utilisation comme fongicides | [1989/05] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0040345 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0061835 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]DE3242249 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0110048 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]DE3315808 (BAYER AG [DE]) |