EP0300437 - Lawn- or garden tractor with an auxiliary device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/04] | Hitch for coupling an auxiliary device to a lawn- or garden tractor | ||
[1994/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Steven Lawrence Rural Route 1 Box 144 Agency Iowa 52530 / US | 02 /
Hining, Larry Demar 1010 Glenwood Avenue Ottumwa Iowa 52501 / US | 03 /
O'Toole, Frank Kenneth 117 West Rochester Road Apt. 51 Ottumwa Iowa 52501 / US | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/04] | Feldmann, Bernhard DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111631.3 | 20.07.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | US19870076638 | 23.07.1987 Original published format: US 76638 | [1989/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300437 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300437 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300437 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01B59/042, A01B51/02 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
A01B59/042 (EP,US);
Y10S56/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/04] | A01B59/042 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Rasen- oder Gartentraktor mit anbaubarem Anbaugerät | [1994/16] | English: | Lawn- or garden tractor with an auxiliary device | [1994/16] | French: | Tracteur à gazon ou à jardin avec un appareil porté | [1994/16] |
Former [1989/04] | Befestigungseinrichtung zur Montage eines Anbaugerätes an einen Rasen- oder Gartentraktor | ||
Former [1989/04] | Hitch for coupling an auxiliary device to a lawn- or garden tractor | ||
Former [1989/04] | Attelage pour monter un appareil porté à un tracteur à gazon ou à jardin | Examination procedure | 02.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 16.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.04.1994 | IT | 20.04.1994 | SE | 20.04.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/23] | IT | 20.04.1994 | |
SE | 20.04.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 20.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE950608 (NIEMEYER SOEHNE STAHL PFLUG); | [Y]US3426458 (SPITZER JAKE R); | [Y]US3508386 (BORCHARDT GERALD N, et al); | [AD]US4600070 (THURNER GARY H [US]) |