EP0309676 - Workstation controller with full screen write mode and partial screen write mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiel, Harvey Gene 1268 Buckride Drive, N.W. Rochester Minnesota 55904 / US | 02 /
Peterson, Ricky Merle 4112 19 1/2 Lane N.W. Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | 03 /
Whitley, Lawrence Dean 3314 9th Avenue N.W: Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1989/14] | Vekemans, André Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 88112034.9 | 26.07.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | US19870103136 | 28.09.1987 Original published format: US 103136 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0309676 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0309676 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309676 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/1423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/14] | Title | German: | Arbeitstellen-Steuergerät zum Schreiben auf einem vollen Bildschirm und zum teilweise Schreiben auf einem Bildschirm | [1989/14] | English: | Workstation controller with full screen write mode and partial screen write mode | [1989/14] | French: | Unité de commande de poste de travail avec mode d'écriture d'écran complet et mode d'écriture d'un écran partiel | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.11.1995 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 02.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0067302 (IBM [US]); | [A]DE3530237 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4642789 (LAVELLE MICHAEL G [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 3B, August 1983, page 1395, New York, US; P.D. MOTOLA et al.: "Communicating word processors workstation screen updating" |