EP0301502 - Fermented milk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states NIKKEN CHEMICALS CO., LTD. 4-14, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIKKEN CHEMICALS CO., LTD. 4-14, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1989/05] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states NIKKEN CHEMICALS CO., LTD. 4-14, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondou, Tsutomu 3-13-16, Hoshigaoka Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1989/05] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112124.8 | 27.07.1988 | [1989/05] | Priority number, date | JP19870188485 | 28.07.1987 Original published format: JP 18848587 | [1989/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0301502 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0301502 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0301502 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/13, A23C11/10 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
A23C11/106 (EP,US);
A23C9/1307 (EP,US);
A23L11/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/05] | Title | German: | Sauermilch | [1989/05] | English: | Fermented milk | [1989/05] | French: | Lait fermenté | [1989/05] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 26.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.06.1992 | CH | 17.06.1992 | LI | 17.06.1992 | NL | 17.06.1992 | SE | 17.06.1992 | [1993/13] |
Former [1993/03] | CH | 17.06.1992 | |
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | CH | 17.06.1992 | |
LI | 17.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2652626 (ZSCHEYGE WILLIAM TH F); | [A]EP0009325 (PFIZER [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 21, May 1983, page 522, abstract no. 177718q, Columbus, Ohio, US; L. HYVOENEN et al.: "Alternative sweetening of yogurt", & J. FOOD TECHNOL. 1983, 18(1), 97-112 |