EP0317710 - High strength, heat resistant aluminum alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 3-8-22, Kamisugi Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 3-8-22, Kamisugi Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Masumoto, Tsuyoshi No. 3-8-22 Uesugi Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masumoto, Tsuyoshi 3-8-22, Kamisugi Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Akihisa Kawauchi-jyutaku 11-806 Kawauchi Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | 03 /
Odera, Katsumasa 203-7, Inuyama Kurobe-shi Toyama / JP | 04 /
Oguchi, Masahiro 1-9-3, Hon-machi Okaya-shi Nagano / JP | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/22] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112257.6 | 28.07.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | JP19870282132 | 10.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28213287 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317710 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317710 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
C22C45/08 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/22] | Title | German: | Hochfeste, hitzebeständige Aluminiumlegierungen | [1989/22] | English: | High strength, heat resistant aluminum alloys | [1989/22] | French: | Alliages d'aluminium à haute résistance et résistant à la chaleur | [1989/22] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE479528 (TH GOLDSCHMIDT AKT GES); | [A]US4347076 (RAY RANJAN, et al); | [A]EP0100287 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, no. 2, 11th July 1988, pages 245-246, abstract no. 10416y, Columbus, Ohio, US; A. INOUE et al.: "New amorphous alloys with good ductility in aluminum-yttrium-M and aluminum-lanthanum-M (M = iron, cobalt, nickel, copper) systems" & JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., PART 2 1988, 27(3), L280-L282 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 71, no. 2, 14th July 1969, page 232, abstract no. 6117f, Columbus, Ohio, US; TITOVA et al.: "Alloys of aluminum with lanthanides for secondary electron emitters", & TR., GOS. NAUCH.-ISSLED. PROEKT. INST. SPLAVOV OBRAB. TSVET. METAL. 1968, No. 27, 12-14 |