EP0303122 - Process for manufacturing spherical hydrated gel containing microorganism immobilized therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki City, Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinozaki, Atushi 2-12-51, Fukutominaka Okayama-city / JP | 02 /
Abe, Kunio 3 Block Apartment-16 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-city / JP | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112327.7 | 29.07.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | JP19870200599 | 10.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20059987 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303122 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303122 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303122 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/04 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
C12N11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1989/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Herstellung von kugelförmigen hydriertem Gel mit darin enthaltenen immobilisierten Mikroorganismen | [1992/31] | English: | Process for manufacturing spherical hydrated gel containing microorganism immobilized therein | [1989/07] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de boules de gel hydraté contenant des microorganismes immobilisés à l'intérieur | [1989/07] |
Former [1989/07] | Verfahren für die Herstellung von sphärischem hydriertem Gel mit darin enthaltenden immobilisierten Mikroorganismen | Examination procedure | 08.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 24.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP62138193 ; | [YD]JP61139385 ; | [AD]JP61100193 ; | [A]JP7316183 ; | [A]US4617271 (NAMBU MASAO [JP]); | [A]EP0060052 (RES ASS PETROLEUM ALTERNAT DEV [JP]) | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 365 (C-460)[2812], 27th November 1987; & JP-A-62 138 193 (KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD) 20-06-1987, & JP62138193 A 00000000 | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 335 (C-384)[2391], 13th November 1986; & JP-A-61 139 385 (SUSUMU HASHIMOTO) 26-06-1986, & JP61139385 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 280 (C-374)[2336], 24th September 1986; & JP-A-61 100 193 (SUSUMU HASHIMOTO) 19-05-1986, & JP61100193 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 79, no. 25, 24th December 1973, page 218, abstract no. 145072r, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-73 16 183 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO., LTD) 19-05-1973, & JP7316183 A 00000000 |