EP0303133 - Flywheel sickle drive mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HESSTON BRAUD (Société Anonyme) F-85220 Coex / FR | [1989/37] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states HESSTON S.A. Division Coex F-85220 - Coex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guinn, Ronald K. Route 1 117th and Rock Road Valley Center Kansas 67147 / US | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1989/37] | Saconney, Piero c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1989/07] | Buzzi, Franco c/o Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri, 17 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 88112431.7 | 01.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | US19870084410 | 10.08.1987 Original published format: US 84410 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0303133 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303133 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/14, F16H21/20 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
F16C3/12 (EP,US);
A01D34/30 (EP,US);
Y10T403/66 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7056 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18208 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2173 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Schwungrad-Antriebsmechanismus für hin- und hergehende Messer | [1989/07] | English: | Flywheel sickle drive mechanism | [1989/07] | French: | Volant de mécanisme de commande d'une lame à va-et-vient | [1992/04] |
Former [1989/07] | Roue volante de mécanisme de commande pour une lame avec un mouvement de va-et-vient | Examination procedure | 31.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 05.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.1992 | BE | 22.01.1992 | CH | 22.01.1992 | GR | 22.01.1992 | LI | 22.01.1992 | NL | 22.01.1992 | SE | 22.01.1992 | ES | 03.05.1992 | LU | 31.08.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 22.01.1992 | |
BE | 22.01.1992 | ||
CH | 22.01.1992 | ||
GR | 22.01.1992 | ||
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
NL | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 22.01.1992 | |
BE | 22.01.1992 | ||
CH | 22.01.1992 | ||
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
NL | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | AT | 22.01.1992 | |
BE | 22.01.1992 | ||
CH | 22.01.1992 | ||
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
NL | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | BE | 22.01.1992 | |
CH | 22.01.1992 | ||
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
NL | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | CH | 22.01.1992 | |
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
NL | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 22.01.1992 | |
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 22.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | US2130795 [ ] (GOLLNICK LEONARD E); | US2438065 [ ] (LOVE JAMES E); | US2555458 [ ] (PAUL SAXTON); | DE958066 [ ] (FAHR AG MASCHF) | Examination | EP0299224 |