EP0305752 - Programmable data path width in a programmable unit having plural levels of subinstruction sets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNISYS CORPORATION 1, Burroughs Place Detroit Michigan 48232 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states UNISYS CORPORATION 1, Burroughs Place Detroit Michigan 48232 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woodward, Thomas R. 878 Westtown Road West Chester PA 19382 / US | 02 /
McCoach, David D. 301 Hamstead Place West Chester PA 19382 / US | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Carmichael, David Andrew Halliday, et al Baron Warren Redfern Lynn House Ivy Arch Road Worthing West Sussex BN14 8BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Carmichael, David Andrew Halliday, et al G.F. REDFERN & CO., Redfern House 149/151 Tarring Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB | ||
Former [1989/10] | Kirby, Harold Douglas Benson G.F. Redfern & Company Marlborough Lodge 14 Farncombe Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 2BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88112570.2 | 26.09.1985 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | US19840656247 | 01.10.1984 Original published format: US 656247 | US19840656547 | 01.10.1984 Original published format: US 656547 | [1989/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0305752 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0305752 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305752 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30, G06F9/22 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
G06F9/30192 (EP);
G06F9/223 (EP);
G06F9/264 (EP);
G06F9/30036 (EP);
G06F9/30038 (EP);
G06F9/30145 (EP);
G06F9/30181 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/10] | G06F9/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/10] | Title | German: | Programmierbare Datenpfadbreite in einer programmierbaren Einheit mit mehreren Niveaus von Unterbefehlssätzen | [1989/10] | English: | Programmable data path width in a programmable unit having plural levels of subinstruction sets | [1989/10] | French: | Largeur de bus de données programmable dans une unité programmable à plusieurs niveaux de jeux de sous-instructions | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 04.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85306836.9 / EP0177268 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 05.05.1993 | [1993/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3983539 (FABER ULBE [US], et al); | [A]EP0097725 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) |