EP0302485 - Thermoplastic molding compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taubitz, Christof, Dr. In der Dreispitz 15 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | 02 /
Muehlbach, Klaus, Dr. Dr.-Heinrich-Winter-Strasse 19 D-6148 Heppenheim / DE | 03 /
Brandt, Hermann, Dr. Keltenstrasse 30 D-6707 Schifferstadt / DE | 04 /
Boehlke, Klaus, Dr. Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 53 D-6717 Hessheim / DE | [1989/06] | Application number, filing date | 88112671.8 | 04.08.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | DE19873726283 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3726283 | [1989/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0302485 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0302485 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08L71/04 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
C08L77/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L71/126 (EP,US);
Y10S525/905 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/126, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/22 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/06] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Formmassen | [1989/06] | English: | Thermoplastic molding compositions | [1989/06] | French: | Compositions à mouler thermoplastiques | [1989/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP59066452 ; | [A]JP61016963 ; | [XP]EP0276768 (BASF AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0253123 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0244090 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) | [AD] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, Nr. 84-130933, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-59 066 452 (UNITIKA K.K.) 14.04.1984, & JP59066452 A 00000000 | [A] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, Nr. 86-065456, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-61 016 963 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM.) 24.01.1986, & JP61016963 A 00000000 |