EP0305763 - Energy-delivering installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1992 [1992/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohra, Alois Bacherstr. 45 D-8000 München 90 / DE | 02 /
Albers, Martin, Dr. Borinskistr. 2a D-8000 München 60 / DE | 03 /
Weist, Günther Lerchenweg 4c D-8138 Andechs / DE | 04 /
Grieb, Hubert, Dr. Ing. Nimrodstr. 38 D-8034 Germering / DE | 05 /
Moddemann, Horst Im Alefoldchen 1 D-5340 Bad Honnef 6 / DE | [1989/10] | Application number, filing date | 88112754.2 | 05.08.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | DE19873726104 | 06.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3726104 | [1989/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305763 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305763 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F01D15/10, H02K7/18, F01D5/02 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
F02C7/24 (EP);
B63G8/12 (EP);
F01D15/10 (EP);
F02C3/34 (EP);
F02C7/20 (EP);
H02K7/1823 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/17] |
Former [1989/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Energieversorgungsanlage | [1989/10] | English: | Energy-delivering installation | [1989/10] | French: | Centrale de délivrance d'énergie | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, ES, GR, LI, LU | 03.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.1988 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 05.09.1988 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 05.09.1988 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 05.09.1988 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 05.09.1988 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 05.09.1988 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE305955 ; | [A]US3039007 (WILLIAMS ALFRED L W, et al); | [A]DE2105494 (BABCOCK & WILCOX AG); | [A]US2984751 (ROBERT CLIBORN); | [A]EP0026584 (NEEDHAM ROBERT WILLIAMS [GB], et al); | [A]GB191223689 (ROLFE ARTHUR [GB]); | [A]FR534202 (LEBLANC VICKERS MAURICE SA [FR]); | [A]GB1141001 (ROLLS ROYCE) | Examination | WO8403538 |