EP0303233 - Human reg protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Hiroshi, Dr. med. 3-205, 2-15, Tsunogoro Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Itoh, Takako 4-45, Fujigaoka Takarazuka-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Teraoka, Hiroshi 2-47-10, Takakuradai Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Tsuzuki, Hiroshige 5-12-15, Osumigaoka Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun Kyoto / JP | 05 /
Yoshida, Nobuo 5-8, Koshiensanban-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo / JP | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112942.3 | 09.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | JP19870200514 | 10.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20051487 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303233 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303233 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02, C12N15/00, C12N1/18, A61K37/02, // (C12N1/18, C12R1:865) | [1989/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/474 (EP);
C07K14/00 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Menschliches reg-Protein | [1989/07] | English: | Human reg protein | [1989/07] | French: | Protéine reg humaine | [1989/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 18.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/39] | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0258000 (UNIV TOHOKU [JP]) | [XPD] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 263, no. 5, 15th February 1988, pages 2111-2114, The American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, Inc., US; K. TERAZONO et al.: "A novel gene activated in regenerating islets" | [AD] - THE LANCET, vol. 1, no. 8533, 14th March 1987, pages 619-620, The Lancet Ltd, London, GB; Ph. VAGUE et al.: "Nicotinamide may extend remission phase in insulin-dependent diabetes" |