EP0354258 - Turndown control method for membrane separation systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [1993/22] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Michael Joseph 5930 Shimerville Road Clarence Center (14032) N.Y. / US | [1990/07] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113010.8 | 10.08.1988 | [1990/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0354258 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354258 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
B01D53/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/39] |
Former [1990/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Teillastregelmethode für Membrantrennsysteme | [1990/07] | English: | Turndown control method for membrane separation systems | [1990/07] | French: | Méthode pour régler la charge partielle pour un système de séparation à membranes | [1990/07] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 02.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8803701U ; | [X]DE1767751 (VVB ENERGIEVERSORGUNG WISSENSC); | [X]US4397661 (KING DUANE E, et al); | [X]GB1052553 ; | [A]US3975170 (KEATING JR STEPHEN JOSEPH) |