EP0303963 - Process and installation for the calcination of limestone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE FILTERBAU GMBH Postfach 26 01 52 40094 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE FILTERBAU GMBH Postfach 26 01 52 D-40094 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartweck, Winfried, G. Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wittgatt 14 D-4000 Düsseldorf-Wittlaer / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Karl Ulrich. Ing.(grad.) Am Franzosensiepen 65a D-4600 Dortmund 50 / DE | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Meinig, Karl-Heinz, et al PATENTANWÄLTE PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER ANWALTSSOZIETÄT Mozartstrasse 17 D-80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | Meinig, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Phys., et al PATENTANWÄLTE PFENNING MEINIG & PARTNER ANWALTSSOZIETÄT Mozartstrasse 17 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113020.7 | 10.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | DE19873727218 | 14.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3727218 | [1989/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303963 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303963 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F27B1/00, C04B2/12, F27B1/08 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
F27B1/22 (EP,US);
C04B2/108 (EP,US);
F27B1/08 (EP,US);
Y02P10/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT [1989/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Calcinierung von Kalkstein | [1989/08] | English: | Process and installation for the calcination of limestone | [1989/08] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la calcination de pierre à chaux | [1989/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/10] | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2710205 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF); | [Y]DE2748510 (PERLMOOSER ZEMENTWERKE AG); | [Y]DE3334686 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]); | [XP]AT386610B (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | [A]FR2104443 (EBARA INFILCO); | [A]DE349726 (SCHMELZ UND HUETTENWERK OBERSC); | [AD]DE2647021 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF) |