EP0307626 - Process for preparing an anti-oxidant spice extract [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aeschbach, Robert Bld. de Charmontey 4 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | 02 /
Philippossian, Georges 18 Av. de Valmont CH-1010 Lausanne / CH | [1989/12] | Application number, filing date | 88113185.8 | 13.08.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | CH19870003574 | 16.09.1987 Original published format: CH 357487 | [1989/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307626 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307626 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/221, A23L3/34 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
A23L3/3463 (EP,US);
A23L27/11 (EP,US);
A23L3/361 (EP,US);
A61K47/46 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/522 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines gegen Oxidierung wirkenden Gewürzextraktes | [1989/12] | English: | Process for preparing an anti-oxidant spice extract | [1989/12] | French: | Procédé d'obention d'un extrait antioxydant d'épices | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2192852 (BROOKE BOND LIEBIG LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2249155 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | [A]US3950226 (CHANG MOON KI); | [AD]EP0038959 (LION CORP [JP]); | [XD]US4450097 (NAKATANI NOBUJI [JP], et al); | [X]GB2184341 (KALAMAZOO HOLDINGS INC) |