EP0309716 - Apparatus for liquefying a highly polymeric thermoplastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, Ohio 44145-1148 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake Ohio 44145-1148 / US | ||
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states Claassen, Henning J. Industriegebiet Hafen D-2120 Lüneburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claassen, Henning J. Industriegebiet Hafen D-2120 Lüneburg / DE | [1990/14] |
Former [1989/14] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113371.4 | 17.08.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | DE19873733029 | 30.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3733029 | [1989/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0309716 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0309716 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29B13/02, B05C5/04, B05C9/14, C09J5/06 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
B29B13/022 (EP);
B05C11/1042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/14] | B29B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verflüssigen eines hochpolymeren, thermoplastischen Werkstoffes | [1989/14] | English: | Apparatus for liquefying a highly polymeric thermoplastic material | [1989/14] | French: | Dispositif pour liquéfier un haut polymère thermoplastique | [1989/14] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/01] | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1935398 ; | [A]EP0220530 (NORDSON CORP [US]); | [AD]DE3600020 (CLAASSEN HENNING J); | [A]EP0150337 (NORDSON CORP [US]) |