EP0304801 - Strut with controlled variable damping rate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states TRW INC. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hudgens Bernard, C. 124 Seminole Drive West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113421.7 | 18.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | US19870089320 | 25.08.1987 Original published format: US 89320 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0304801 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0304801 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304801 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/46, B60G17/00 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
B60G17/0152 (EP,US);
B60G17/0195 (EP,US);
F16F9/446 (EP,US);
F16F9/464 (EP,US);
B60G2202/24 (EP,US);
B60G2400/204 (EP,US);
B60G2400/252 (EP,US);
B60G2400/41 (EP,US);
B60G2400/412 (EP,US);
B60G2500/104 (EP,US);
B60G2500/11 (EP,US);
B60G2500/30 (EP,US);
B60G2500/32 (EP,US);
B60G2600/20 (EP,US);
B60G2600/26 (EP,US);
B60G2600/70 (EP,US);
B60G2800/012 (EP,US);
B60G2800/9122 (EP,US);
B60G2800/96 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/09] | Title | German: | Federbein mit geregelter variabler Dämpfung | [1989/09] | English: | Strut with controlled variable damping rate | [1989/09] | French: | Jambe de suspension à taux d'amortissement variable réglé | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 02.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.12.1993 | IT | 01.12.1993 | ES | 12.03.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/03] | IT | 01.12.1993 | |
ES | 12.03.1994 | ||
FR | 22.04.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 01.12.1993 | |
FR | 22.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | FR | 22.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2552515 (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [Y]DE1455932 (RHEINMETALL GMBH); | [AP]GB2191263 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG); | [A]US2950785 (PATRIQUIN WILLIAM G); | [A]DE2911768 (F & O ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS); | [AD]US4600215 (KUROKI JUNSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]EP0197316 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4682675 (EDDY JR WILLIAM C [US]); | [AD]US4596320 (SHIMOKURA AKIHIRO [JP], et al); | [AD]US4468050 (WOODS LONNIE K [US], et al); | [AD]US2992836 (VOGEL ARTHUR E); | [AD]US4293139 (BROWN ARTHUR K) |