EP0306742 - Method for automatically detecting faults in moving textile webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johannes Menschner Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co KG Kampweg 40 D-41751 Viersen / DE | [1989/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hentschel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Edinger Strasse 21 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Müller, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Fröhlichstrasse 46 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Sonnet, Bernd, et al Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Postfach 20 16 53 42216 Wuppertal / DE | [2008/44] |
Former [1989/11] | Sonnet, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Ostriga & Sonnet Postfach 20 16 53 D-42216 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113425.8 | 18.08.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | DE19873729804 | 05.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3729804 | [1989/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0306742 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0306742 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D06H3/08, G01N21/89 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
D03J1/007 (EP);
D06H3/08 (EP);
G01N21/8983 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/11] | D06H3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1989/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Erkennung von Fehlern in bewegten Warenbahnen | [1989/11] | English: | Method for automatically detecting faults in moving textile webs | [1989/11] | French: | Procédé pour détecter automatiquement les défauts de bandes textiles en mouvement | [1989/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3536991 (SIPRA PATENT BETEILIGUNG); | [A]DE3133428 (VYZK USTAV PLETARSKY [CS]) |