EP0305838 - Use of glycidoxypropylsilanol and polydimethylsiloxanes and aqueous releasing agents containing these compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1991 [1991/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seltmann, Hans-Günther, Dr. Oranienburger Strasse 100 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 02 /
Härer, Jürgen, Dr. Johannes-Hesse-Strasse 3 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 03 /
Hoffmann, Hans-Josef Brunnenstrasse 60 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | [1989/10] | Application number, filing date | 88113596.6 | 22.08.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | DE19873729039 | 31.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3729039 | [1989/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305838 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305838 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/64, C08L83/04, C09D3/82 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
B29C33/64 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08L2666/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/10] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Glycidoxypropylsilanol und Polydimethylsiloxanen und diese enthaltende wässrige Formentrennmittel | [1989/10] | English: | Use of glycidoxypropylsilanol and polydimethylsiloxanes and aqueous releasing agents containing these compounds | [1989/10] | French: | Utilisation du silanol de glycidoxypropyle et des polysiloxanes de diméthyle et agents de démoulage qui les contiennent | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/43] | 15.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1913684 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]US3872038 (ADAMS WILLIAM KIGER, et al); | [A]EP0202494 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]) |