EP0308659 - Method and device for cleaning pallets for the moulding of plates of a hardenable plastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRAAS GMBH Frankfurter Landstrasse 2-4 61440 Oberursel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states BRAAS GmbH Frankfurter Landstrasse 2-4 D-61440 Oberursel / DE | ||
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states BRAAS & CO. GMBH Frankfurter Landstrasse 2-4 D-6370 Oberursel 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häring, Karl-Heinz Gardistenstrasse 20 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Fecher, Helmut Hauptstrasse 91 D-6452 Hainburg / DE | 03 /
Weisweiler, Manfred Odenwaldring 192 D-6072 Dreieichenhain / DE | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1990/12] |
Former [1989/13] | Brehm, Hans-Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113615.4 | 22.08.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | DE19873732357 | 25.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732357 | [1989/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308659 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308659 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/38 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
B28B7/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Unterformen zum Formen von Platten aus einer härtbaren plastischen Masse im Strangpressverfahren | [1989/13] | English: | Method and device for cleaning pallets for the moulding of plates of a hardenable plastic material | [1989/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le nettoyage des plaques d'assise pour le moulage de dalles à partir d'une masse plastique durcissable | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2752621 [ ] (WARSAW DAVID J); | AT374729B [ ] (BRAAS & CO GMBH [DE]) |