EP0315741 - Drive unit for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Badstrasse 21 D-7251 Moensheim / DE | 02 /
Gausrab, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Knoedlergasse 4 D-7302 Ostfildern 2 / DE | [1989/20] | Application number, filing date | 88113648.5 | 23.08.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | DE19873738008 | 09.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3738008 | [1989/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315741 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315741 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/35, F16D41/04 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
F16D43/18 (EP,US);
B60K17/3505 (EP,US);
F16D41/04 (EP,US);
F16D47/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Antrieb eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1989/20] | English: | Drive unit for motor vehicle | [1989/20] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour véhicule automobile | [1989/20] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 18.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2791130 (BOUGHNER LAWRENCE G); | [Y]US3327822 (SPENCER GLENN S); | [A]GB2139972 (VOLKSWAGEN AG); | [AD]DE3507490 (PORSCHE AG); | [X]DE3708193 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0214757 | EP0240795 |