EP0304880 - Programmable controller with parallel processors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, INC. 1201 South Second Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, INC. 1201 South Second Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stewart, Daniel L. 1431 Gettysburg Drive Parma Ohio 44134 / US | 02 /
Immormino, Fredrick R. 1002 Oakview Drive Highland Heights Ohio 44143 / US | 03 /
Galdun, Daniel L. 14179 Mayfield Road Huntsburg Ohio 44046 / US | 04 /
Rischar, Charles M. 98 Larchwood Drive Painsville Ohio 44077 / US | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Lippert, Hans, et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Lippert, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113732.7 | 24.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | US19870089587 | 26.08.1987 Original published format: US 89587 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0304880 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0304880 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304880 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
G05B19/052 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/09] | G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1989/09] | Title | German: | Programmierbare Steuerung mit parallelen Prozessoren | [1989/09] | English: | Programmable controller with parallel processors | [1989/09] | French: | Automate programmable avec des processeurs en parallèle | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4442504 (DUMMERMUTH ERNST H [US], et al); | [A]US4550366 (TOYAMA FUMIYASU [JP], et al); | [X]US4564913 (YOMOGIDA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0174230 (QUATSE JESSE T); | [A]DE3610433 (ALLEN BRADLEY CO [US]) |