EP0307701 - Process for preparing moisture-curable binder combinations, combinations obtained by this process and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1992 [1992/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blum, Harald, Dr. Auf dem Westkamp 1 D-4175 Wachtendonk / DE | 02 /
Pedain, Josef, Dr. Haferkamp 6 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 03 /
Wamprecht, Christian, Dr. Bahnhofstrasse 51 D-4040 Neuss 22 / DE | [1989/12] | Application number, filing date | 88114038.8 | 29.08.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | DE19873730066 | 08.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3730066 | [1989/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307701 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307701 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/06, C09D7/12, C08K5/34, C08K5/35, C08L35/00, C08L33/06, C08F8/32 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
C09D133/064 (EP,US);
C08F8/32 (EP,US);
C08K5/3445 (EP,US);
C08K5/3462 (EP,US);
C08K5/35 (EP,US);
C09D135/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/3445, C08L35/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/3462, C08L35/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/35, C08L35/00 (US,EP);
C09D133/064, C08L2666/36 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1989/12] | C09D3/727, C09D7/12, C08K5/34, C08K5/35, C08L35/00, C08L33/06, C08F8/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von feuchtigkeitshärtenden Bindemittelkombinationen, die nach diesem Verfahren erhältlichen Kombinationen und ihre Verwendung | [1989/12] | English: | Process for preparing moisture-curable binder combinations, combinations obtained by this process and their use | [1989/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation de combinaisons hydrodurcissables de liants, combinaisons préparées par ce procédé et leur emploi | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 12.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2853477 (BAYER AG); | [A]EP0001065 ; | [A]EP0070536 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | Examination | DE2610406 |