EP0314892 - Sensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kipphan, Helmut, Prof. Dr. Bibiena Strasse 6 D-6830 Schwetzingen / DE | 02 /
Haase, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lindemannstrasse 8 D-6903 Neckargemünd / DE | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo, et al c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert, et al c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1989/19] | Voth, Gerhard Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114179.0 | 31.08.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | DE19873732934 | 30.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732934 | [1989/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314892 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314892 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/06, G01B11/30, G01N21/55 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
G01N21/55 (EP,US);
B41F33/0063 (EP,US);
G01N2021/559 (EP,US);
G01N2021/5957 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/36] |
Former [1989/19] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE | Title | German: | Sensoreinrichtung | [1989/19] | English: | Sensing device | [1989/19] | French: | Bloc détecteur | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/19] | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2055708 [ ] (BRUN SENSOR SYSTEM INC); | DE3414573 [ ] (GRAPHO METRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]); | CH389935 [ ] (BELMAG ZUERICH BELEUCHTUNGS UN [CH]); | DE3312948 [ ] (PENTACON DRESDEN VEB [DD]); | EP0126613 [ ] (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | DD145956 [ ] (HUNDT ELVIRA, et al) | Examination | EP0177921 |