|
06.11.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1998 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1998 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
19 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
07.11.1997 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.09.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.1997 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
22.03.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.01.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.1996 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
26 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
20 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.10.1995 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1995 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.1994 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.05.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
31 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
05.06.1992 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.10.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.10.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.05.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.1989 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
12.10.1988 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.09.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.09.1988 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.09.1988 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |