EP0313769 - Method and apparatus for the intermittent straightening of wires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.A. SCHLATTER AG Brandstrasse 24 8952 Schlieren / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states H.A. SCHLATTER AG Brandstrasse 24 CH-8952 Schlieren Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denzler, Emil Ländliweg 21 CH-8116 Würenlos / CH | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Keller, René, et al Dr. R. Keller & Partner Patentanwälte Marktgasse 31 Postfach CH-3000 Bern 7 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Keller, René, Dr., et al Dr. R. Keller & Partner Patentanwälte Marktgasse 31 Postfach CH-3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 88114418.2 | 03.09.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | CH19870003819 | 01.10.1987 Original published format: CH 381987 | [1989/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313769 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313769 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313769 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B21F1/02 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
B21F1/026 (EP,US);
B21F1/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum intermittierenden Richten von Draht | [1989/18] | English: | Method and apparatus for the intermittent straightening of wires | [1989/18] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le redressage intermittent de fils | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 20.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP58122139 ; | [AD]US1594570 (SLEEPER FRANK H); | [AD]US1703885 (COLE HUTCHINSON FRANK); | [AD]US2172134 (JAMES WRIGHT ALBERT FREDERICK); | [AD]US2965150 (HUNTER ROBERT C); | [AD]CH475806 (FINZER HEINZ [DE]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 230 (M-249)[1375], 12. Oktober 1983; & JP-A-58 122 139 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO K.K.) 20-07-1983, & JP58122139 A 00000000 |