EP0308729 - Process and arrangement for creating a partial protective gas atmosphere [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Ewald, Dipl.-Ing. Welluckenweg 9 D-8524 Neunkirchen am Brand / DE | 02 /
Teig, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. Fliederweg 18 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1989/13] | Application number, filing date | 88114623.7 | 07.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | DE19873731729 | 21.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3731729 | [1989/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308729 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308729 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/16, B23K9/02 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
B23K9/0288 (EP,US);
B23K9/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [1989/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Bilden einer partiellen Schutzgasatmosphäre | [1989/13] | English: | Process and arrangement for creating a partial protective gas atmosphere | [1989/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour établir une atmosphère partielle de gaz protecteur | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3736400 (SPIEGEL J, et al); | [A]US3994429 (HALLENBECK EMERSON J, et al); | [A]FR2578957 (THOME PAUL [FR]) |