EP0312759 - Filter for water purification, especially for swimming pools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRUNO KERN GMBH Johannesberger Strasse 40 D-8752 Mömbris/Ufr. / DE | [1989/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wuschik, Günther Friedhofweg 9 D-8751 Leidersbach / DE | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Siegmar, et al Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Schubert, Siegmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 D-60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114782.1 | 09.09.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | DE19870012336U | 11.09.1987 Original published format: DE 8712336 U | [1989/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0312759 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/12, B01D35/26, E04H3/20 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
B01D35/05 (EP);
B01D29/05 (EP);
B01D29/56 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B01D29/05, B01D29/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1989/17] | Title | German: | Filter zur Wasserreinigung, insbesondere von Schwimmbädern | [1989/17] | English: | Filter for water purification, especially for swimming pools | [1989/17] | French: | Filtre de purification de l'eau spécialement de piscines | [1989/17] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/06] | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT315204B (HEIMO HERLT [DE]); | [A]DE8704480U ; | [A]EP0060677 (AMSTED IND INC [US]); | [A]DE1940698 (SHAMBAN & CO W S) |