EP0308750 - Base precursor and light-sensitive material containing base precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/13] | Base precursor, process for formation of base and light-sensitive material containing base precursor | ||
[1995/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yabuki, Yoshiharu No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Tsukahara, Jiro No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Taku No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114790.4 | 09.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | JP19870226134 | 09.09.1987 Original published format: JP 22613487 | JP19870226135 | 09.09.1987 Original published format: JP 22613587 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308750 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308750 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/06, G03C1/60, G03C1/494, G03F7/027, G03C8/00 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
G03C1/615 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/13] | G03C1/06, G03C1/60, G03C1/02, G03C1/68, G03C5/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/13] | Title | German: | Basevorläufer und lichtempfindliches basevorläuferenthaltendes Material | [1995/50] | English: | Base precursor and light-sensitive material containing base precursor | [1995/50] | French: | Précurseur de base et matériau sensible à la lumière comprenant un précurseur de base | [1995/50] |
Former [1989/13] | Basevorläufer, Verfahren zur Baseerzeugung und lichtempfindliches basevorläuferenthaltendes Material | ||
Former [1989/13] | Base precursor, process for formation of base and light-sensitive material containing base precursor | ||
Former [1989/13] | Précurseur de base, procédé de production de base et matériau sensible à la lumière comprenant un précurseur de base | Examination procedure | 29.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 05.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.12.1995 | [2003/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD221477 ; | [Y]FR1580688 ; | [A]FR2272645 (UPJOHN CO [US]); | [YD]US4060420 (MERKEL PAUL BARRETT, et al); | [Y]EP0160996 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0234580 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | JPS56147761 | - BEILSTEIN, H4, 254, E III 4, page 533 | - BEILSTEIN, H4, 269, E III 4, page 606 |