EP0307832 - Composition with dichlorotrifluorethane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | [1989/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchwald, Hans Am Rodelberg 51 A D-3003 Ronnenberg 3 / DE | 02 /
Raschkowski, Boleslaus In der Hespe 246 D-3061 Wiedensahl / DE | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Dieter c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114842.3 | 10.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | DE19873731223 | 17.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3731223 | [1989/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0307832 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0307832 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307832 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/60, B29C33/62 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
B29C33/60 (EP,US);
B29C33/62 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/12] | B29C33/60 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/12] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen mit Dichlortrifluorethan | [1989/12] | English: | Composition with dichlorotrifluorethane | [1989/12] | French: | Composition avec du dichlorotrifluoréthane | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 17.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB914447 (BRUCE GARDNER HOOD, et al); | [A]DE1925675 (CHEM TREND INC); | [A]DE1816453 (HOECHST AG); | [AD]DE2552236 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [Y]US4032467 (HUTCHINSON WILLIAM M); | [A]FR2439228 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]); | [AD]DE3335870 (KALI CHEMIE AG [DE]) | [Y] - KUNSTSTOFFE, Band 72, Nr. 8, August 1982, Seiten 461-462, München, DE; K. SCHARDT: "Einflussgrössen beim Einsatz von Trennmitteln" |